KS SB279 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unlawful sexual relations, foster parents and foster children.
Title
Unlawful sexual relations, foster parents and foster children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in House Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2012-02-06 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-02 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-01 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-02-01 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-01-26 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-13 | Hearing: Tuesday, January 17, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S | |
2012-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-12 | Introduced |