KS SB265 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a KPERS death and long-term disability employer contribution moratorium.
Title
Providing a KPERS death and long-term disability employer contribution moratorium.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2021-04-06 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 16, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |