KS SB265 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the state board of tax appeals to serve orders and notices by electronic means if requested by the party.
Title
Requiring the state board of tax appeals to serve orders and notices by electronic means if requested by the party.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on House Calendar |
2020-05-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation |
2020-03-11 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 18, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 23, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |