KS SB265 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying what conduct is excluded from the crime of incest.
Title
Clarifying what conduct is excluded from the crime of incest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 05, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2018-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |