KS SB263 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 20, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 20, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a program to research the use of industrial hemp.
Title
Creating a program to research the use of industrial hemp.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 3 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 3 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 20, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 10, 2018 |
2018-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-04-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-03-28 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1 |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture |
2018-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 582-N |
2018-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2018-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 36 Nay: 3 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Rogers was adopted |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Rogers |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Fitzgerald was adopted |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Fitzgerald |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kerschen was adopted |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kerschen |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Wednesday, January 17, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 159-S |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 16, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 159-S |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 05, 2018 |