KS SB260 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state agencies and providing for certain audits.
Title
Concerning state agencies and providing for certain audits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 08, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-30 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 |
2018-04-30 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-04-30 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2018-03-29 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz appointed as conferees |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Estes , Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees |
2018-03-28 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 346-S |
2018-02-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-02-21 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 08, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, December 21, 2017 |