KS SB259 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the testimony of an examining healthcare provider may be submitted in evidence by the provider's medical report in workers compensation cases.
Title
Providing that the testimony of an examining healthcare provider may be submitted in evidence by the provider's medical report in workers compensation cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 25, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Introduced |