KS SB252 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for exemptions from property tax and sales tax for certain businesses competing against governmental entities.
Title
Providing for exemptions from property tax and sales tax for certain businesses competing against governmental entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 24 Nay: 16 (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2023-03-29 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 24 Nay: 16 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 21, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |