KS SB244 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal budgets; notifications.
Title
Municipal budgets; notifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 281-N |
2015-03-18 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development; Rereferred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-03-11 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Local Government; Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2015-03-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-03-10 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Love was adopted |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Love |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 23, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Introduced |