KS SB234 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring same appraisal methodology for real and personal property residential mobile homes for property taxation purposes.
Title
Requiring same appraisal methodology for real and personal property residential mobile homes for property taxation purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 16, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |