KS SB233 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a civil cause of action against a physician who performs childhood gender reassignment service and requiring revocation of a physician's license who performs childhood gender reassignment service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a civil cause of action against a physician who performs childhood gender reassignment service and requiring revocation of a physician's license who performs childhood gender reassignment service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 26 Nay: 11 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-01HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2023-03-01HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2023-02-23SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 26 Nay: 11
2023-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2023-02-20SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2023-02-14SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 8:30 AM Room Room Change to 546
2023-02-13SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2023-02-10SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback