KS SB231 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 14 May 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 14 May 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 231 - Concerning valuation and appeals; renaming the state court of tax appeals; timing of decisions.
Title
House Substitute for SB 231 - Concerning valuation and appeals; renaming the state court of tax appeals; timing of decisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 13 (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 28 Nay: 12 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 28 Nay: 12 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 14 May 2014 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 12, 2014 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 26 Nay: 13 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2014-05-02 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2014-05-02 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2014-05-02 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2014-03-26 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Carlson, Representative Edmonds and Representative Sawyer appointed as conferees |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Donovan , Senator Tyson and Senator Holland as conferees |
2014-03-20 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brunk was adopted |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Brunk |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2014-03-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2013-04-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2013-04-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Engrossed on Wednesday, 03 April 2013 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 28 Nay: 12 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce; Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |