KS SB228 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - House Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 87 Nay: 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - House Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 87 Nay: 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the secretary for aging and disability services to reimburse counties for certain costs when a person is in a county jail awaiting examination, evaluation or treatment for competency, modernizing statutes concerning county jails, removing the requirement that every county shall have a jail, modifying procedures used when district courts commit prisoners to jail in another county and when counties contract with city jails to keep prisoners and requiring a medical examination before certain United States prisoners or city prisoners are taken into custody of a county jail.
Title
Requiring the secretary for aging and disability services to reimburse counties for certain costs when a person is in a county jail awaiting examination, evaluation or treatment for competency, modernizing statutes concerning county jails, removing the requirement that every county shall have a jail, modifying procedures used when district courts commit prisoners to jail in another county and when counties contract with city jails to keep prisoners and requiring a medical examination before certain United States prisoners or city prisoners are taken into custody of a county jail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 87 Nay: 37 (Y: 87 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 31 Nay: 9 (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 33 Nay: 3 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 86 Nay: 37 (Y: 86 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 3 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 31 Nay: 9 (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 33 Nay: 3 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 86 Nay: 37 (Y: 86 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 3 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | House Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 87 Nay: 37 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 31 Nay: 9 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Thursday, April 20, 2023 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 33 Nay: 3 |
2023-04-06 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 86 Nay: 37 |
2023-04-06 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson appointed as second conferees |
2023-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Owens, Representative Smith, E. and Representative Highberger appointed as second conferees |
2023-04-05 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2023-03-29 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Owens, Representative Smith, E. and Representative Highberger appointed as conferees |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Warren , Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson as conferees |
2023-03-27 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2023-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-03-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2023-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 8, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2023-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2023-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 3 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Senator Warren raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Corson was rejected |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Corson |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |