KS SB225 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the hospital provider assessment rate and uses and membership of the healthcare access improvement panel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the hospital provider assessment rate and uses and membership of the healthcare access improvement panel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 31 Nay: 9 (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Died in House Committee
2020-03-09HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-03-09HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-03-05SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 31 Nay: 9
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was rejected
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator McGinn was adopted
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator McGinn
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means
2020-02-24SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Public Health and Welfare; Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-05-03SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-03-20SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-03-19SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N - CANCELED
2019-03-14SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Public Health and Welfare; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-14SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-03-13SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback