KS SB21 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-19 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 19, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-19 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 19, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an annual sales tax holiday for sales of certain school supplies.
Title
Providing an annual sales tax holiday for sales of certain school supplies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 19, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |