KS SB21 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 25 May 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 25 May 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments relating to school district funds; enacting the uniform financial accounting and reporting act.
Title
Amendments relating to school district funds; enacting the uniform financial accounting and reporting act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-13 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 34 Nay: 0 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 34 Nay: 0 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 1 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 1 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 34 Nay: 0 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 34 Nay: 0 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 1 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 1 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 25 May 2011 | |
2011-06-01 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 20, 2011 | |
2011-05-12 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 34 Nay: 0 | |
2011-05-12 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2011-05-12 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 2 | |
2011-05-12 | Conference committee report now available | |
2011-05-12 | Representative Huebert replaces Representative Aurand on the Conference Committee | |
2011-05-12 | Motion to accede adopted; Senator Schodorf, Senator Vratil and Senator Hensley appointed as 2nd conferees | |
2011-05-12 | Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Gordon, Representative Aurand and Representative Winn appointed as second conferees | |
2011-05-12 | Conference committee report now available | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to accede adopted; Representative Gordon, Representative Aurand and Representative Winn appointed as conferees | |
2011-05-05 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Schodorf , Senator Hensley and Senator Vratil as conferees | |
2011-05-05 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 1 | |
2011-05-04 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2011-05-04 | The amendment was divided: Part A was adopted; Part B was not adopted. | |
2011-05-04 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Goodman | |
2011-05-04 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-05-04 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2011-04-28 | Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2011-03-29 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education Budget | |
2011-03-21 | Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Education Budget | |
2011-03-18 | Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-14 | Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-03-10 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education Budget | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Committee on Education Budget | |
2011-02-09 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-09 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 | |
2011-02-08 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2011-02-04 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-14 | Introduced |