KS SB201 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, June 9, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, June 9, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Kansas consumer protection act; protected consumer to include member of the military.
Title
Kansas consumer protection act; protected consumer to include member of the military.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 0 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained - Yea: 72 Nay: 42 (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 0 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained - Yea: 72 Nay: 42 (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, June 9, 2017 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, June 02, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-25 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2017-05-25 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2017-05-23 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz appointed as conferees |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Estes , Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees |
2017-05-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 0 |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Schreiber was adopted |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Schreiber |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained Yea: 72 Nay: 42 |
2017-05-19 | House | House Representative Barker raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-05-12 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-05-05 | House | House Hearing: Friday, May 05, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S |
2017-05-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-05-02 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from calendar; rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |