KS SB20 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the state banking code.
Title
Amending the state banking code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 36 Nay: 4 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 108 Nay: 15 (Y: 108 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 36 Nay: 3 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 108 Nay: 15 (Y: 108 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 36 Nay: 3 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 36 Nay: 4 |
2017-03-23 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kelly, Representative Powell and Representative Finney appointed as conferees |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Billinger and Senator Rogers as conferees |
2017-03-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 108 Nay: 15 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2017-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 281-N |
2017-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2017-02-09 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 36 Nay: 3 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 546-S |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |