KS SB2 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Pending: Senate Public Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the federal medical assistance percentage stabilization fund; limiting transfers from such fund, specified uses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the federal medical assistance percentage stabilization fund; limiting transfers from such fund, specified uses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-02-18SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-01-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-14SenateSenate Introduced
2019-01-14SenateSenate Prefiled for Introduction on Wednesday, November 7, 2018

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback