KS SB199 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for short-term, limited-duration health plans.
Title
Providing for short-term, limited-duration health plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 28 Nay: 9 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 28 Nay: 11 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 73 Nay: 49 (Y: 73 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 27 Nay: 6 (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 28 Nay: 11 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 73 Nay: 49 (Y: 73 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 27 Nay: 6 (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 28 Nay: 9 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Monday, April 11, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 28 Nay: 11 |
2022-03-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 73 Nay: 49 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2022-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 7, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2022-02-02 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 2, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 218-N - CANCELED |
2021-04-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2021-04-06 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 27 Nay: 6 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Thursday, March 25, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 18, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |