KS SB194 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - House Emergency Final Action - Not passed; Yea: 50 Nay: 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - House Emergency Final Action - Not passed; Yea: 50 Nay: 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring hospital district board members to be qualified electors of the county where the hospital is located or any adjacent county.
Title
Requiring hospital district board members to be qualified electors of the county where the hospital is located or any adjacent county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Not passed - Yea: 50 Nay: 73 (Y: 50 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Not passed; Yea: 50 Nay: 73 |
2023-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2023-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed |
2023-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government |
2023-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 8, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2023-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 2 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Billinger was adopted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Billinger |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |