KS SB192 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Under Kansas income tax act; providing rate changes, determination of Kansas adjusted gross income and sunsetting certain modifications, itemized deductions.
Title
Under Kansas income tax act; providing rate changes, determination of Kansas adjusted gross income and sunsetting certain modifications, itemized deductions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb192/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb192_00_0000.pdf |