KS SB19 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, June 15, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, June 15, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Kansas school equity and enhancement act.
Title
Creating the Kansas school equity and enhancement act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 23 Nay: 17 (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 67 Nay: 55 (Y: 67 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 32 Nay: 91 (Y: 32 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-17 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 67 Nay: 55 (Y: 67 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 32 Nay: 91 (Y: 32 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-17 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, June 15, 2017 |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, June 09, 2017 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 23 Nay: 17 |
2017-06-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 67 Nay: 55 |
2017-06-05 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Denning, Senator McGinn and Senator Hensley appointed as third conferees |
2017-06-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Campbell, Representative Aurand and Representative Trimmer appointed as third conferees |
2017-06-05 | House | House Motion to Reconsider Adopted |
2017-06-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 32 Nay: 91 |
2017-06-05 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Denning, Senator McGinn and Senator Hensley appointed as second conferees |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-06-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Campbell, Representative Aurand and Representative Trimmer appointed as second conferees |
2017-06-04 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-06-04 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Senate Senator Denning, Senator McGinn, and Senator Hensley are appointed to replace Senator Longbine, Senator Billinger, and Senator Rogers on the Conference Committee |
2017-06-01 | House | House Representative Campbell, Representative Aurand, and Representative Trimmer are appointed to replace Representative Vickrey, Representative Dove, and Representative Neighbor on the Conference Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Vickrey, Representative Dove and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Billinger and Senator Rogers as conferees |
2017-03-17 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance |
2017-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 281-N |
2017-02-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2017-02-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 19, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 546-S |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |