KS SB185 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing redevelopment districts encompassing federal enclaves to impose utility franchise fees, incur debt, issue bonds and enter into lease-purchase agreements.
Title
Authorizing redevelopment districts encompassing federal enclaves to impose utility franchise fees, incur debt, issue bonds and enter into lease-purchase agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 2 (Y: 123 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 2 (Y: 123 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 02, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 2 |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Proehl was adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Proehl |
2018-03-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2018-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 112-N |
2018-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2018-02-28 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |