KS SB182 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for water measuring device inspections and limiting the liability of water right owners regarding water measuring devices and the use of water measuring device technicians.
Title
Providing for water measuring device inspections and limiting the liability of water right owners regarding water measuring devices and the use of water measuring device technicians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 21, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb182/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb182_00_0000.pdf |