KS SB181 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid; restrictions of prescription-only drugs.
Title
Medicaid; restrictions of prescription-only drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 16, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 546S |
2015-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was adopted |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 17, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 118-N |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |