KS SB18 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for Substitute for SB 18 by Committee on Judiciary – Regulating access to certain law enforcement audio and video recordings and adding an exception to disclosure under the open records act.
Title
House Substitute for Substitute for SB 18 by Committee on Judiciary – Regulating access to certain law enforcement audio and video recordings and adding an exception to disclosure under the open records act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2016-02-09 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-29 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 04, 2016, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2015-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112-N-CANCELLED |
2015-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112-N-CANCELLED |
2015-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 02, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 118-N |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 29, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 118-N |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |