KS SB174 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting all social security benefits from Kansas income tax.
Title
Exempting all social security benefits from Kansas income tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S - CANCELED |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |