KS SB173 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the high-density at-risk student weighting, requiring certain transfers to the at-risk fund of a school district and establishing requirements for school district at-risk fund expenditures and for identification of students eligible to receive at-risk programs and services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the high-density at-risk student weighting, requiring certain transfers to the at-risk fund of a school district and establishing requirements for school district at-risk fund expenditures and for identification of students eligible to receive at-risk programs and services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
2021-03-04SenateSenate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-03-03SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2021-03-01SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
2021-02-18SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 18, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
2021-02-09SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2021-02-08SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback