KS SB171 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Senate No motion to reconsider line item vetoes; Vetoes sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Senate No motion to reconsider line item vetoes; Vetoes sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations for FY 2013, FY 2014, FY 2015, FY 2016, FY 2017, and FY 2018 for various state agencies; capital improvement projects; claims against the state.
Title
Appropriations for FY 2013, FY 2014, FY 2015, FY 2016, FY 2017, and FY 2018 for various state agencies; capital improvement projects; claims against the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 21 Nay: 15 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 51 (Y: 63 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Rhoades, Representative Suellentrop and Representative Henry appointed as fourth conferees - Yea: 5 Nay: 109 (Y: 5 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 57 (Y: 63 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 51 (Y: 63 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Rhoades, Representative Suellentrop and Representative Henry appointed as fourth conferees - Yea: 5 Nay: 109 (Y: 5 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 57 (Y: 63 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Senate No motion to reconsider line item vetoes; Vetoes sustained |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor except line item veto of Sec. 29(f), Sec. 44(c), Sec. 44(d), Sec. 44(f), Sec. 45(b), Sec. 87(h), Sec. 87(i), Sec. 88(g), Sec. 88(h), Sec. 88(i), Sec. 111(t), Sec. 111(w), Sec. 112(s), Sec.123(l); Sec. 124(j); Sec. 167(e); Sec. 168(e); Sec. 174; Sec. 193(c); Sec. 199; Sec. 200Sec. 173(h), on Saturday, June 15, 2013 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Thursday, June 06, 2013 |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 21 Nay: 15 |
2013-06-01 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 63 Nay: 51 |
2013-06-01 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Masterson, Senator Denning and Senator Kelly appointed as fourth conferees |
2013-05-24 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Rhoades, Representative Suellentrop and Representative Henry appointed as fourth conferees |
2013-05-24 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2013-05-21 | House | House Representative Henry replaces Representative Winn on the Conference Committee |
2013-05-21 | House | House Representative Suellentrop replaces Representative Grosserode on the Conference Committee |
2013-05-21 | House | House Representative Rhoades replaces Representative Cassidy on the Conference Committee |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Senator Kelly replaces Senator Hensley on the Conference Committee |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Senator Denning replaces Senator Arpke on the Conference Committee |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Senator Masterson replaces Senator Abrams on the Conference Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Cassidy, Representative Grosserode and Representative Winn appointed as third conferees |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Abrams, Senator Arpke and Senator Hensley appointed as third conferees |
2013-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 63 Nay: 57 |
2013-04-05 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Abrams, Senator Arpke and Senator Hensley appointed as second conferees |
2013-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Cassidy, Representative Grosserode and Representative Winn appointed as second conferees |
2013-04-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Cassidy, Representative Grosserode and Representative Winn appointed as conferees |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Abrams , Senator Arpke and Senator Hensley as conferees |
2013-03-26 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-19 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 281-N |
2013-03-19 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on Education Budget |
2013-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |