KS SB163 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending unemployment insurance disqualification provisions relating to dates disqualification begins, recovery from illness or injury and part-time employment for an educational institution.
Title
Amending unemployment insurance disqualification provisions relating to dates disqualification begins, recovery from illness or injury and part-time employment for an educational institution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 23, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 25, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |