KS SB155 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminating criminal and professional penalties for non-intoxicating cannabinoid medicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminating criminal and professional penalties for non-intoxicating cannabinoid medicine.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, February 20, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2017-02-06SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-02-03SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback