KS SB155 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-01 - Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 22, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-01 - Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 22, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments regarding career technical education; at-risk pupil weightings.
Title
Amendments regarding career technical education; at-risk pupil weightings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-20 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 0 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-20 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 111 Nay: 0 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 92 Nay: 31 (Y: 92 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-20 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 111 Nay: 0 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 92 Nay: 31 (Y: 92 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 22, 2012 | |
2012-05-20 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 0 | |
2012-05-20 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-05-20 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 3(f) - 30 Minute Rule adopted | |
2012-05-20 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 111 Nay: 0 | |
2012-05-20 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-05-20 | Conference committee report now available | |
2012-05-20 | Representative Winn replaces Representative Ward on the Conference Committee | |
2012-03-26 | Motion to accede adopted; Representative Aurand, Representative Huebert and Representative Ward appointed as conferees | |
2012-03-21 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Schodorf , Senator Vratil and Senator Hensley as conferees | |
2012-03-21 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 92 Nay: 31 | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kiegerl was withdrawn | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kiegerl | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend by Rep. Otto - ruled out of order. | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Otto | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar | |
2012-03-16 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing: Thursday, March 01, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 784 Docking | |
2011-02-25 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-02-24 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-24 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2011-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2011-02-21 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced |