KS SB150 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - House Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting housing protections for victims of domestic violence, sexual assault, human trafficking or stalking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting housing protections for victims of domestic violence, sexual assault, human trafficking or stalking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2019-03-15HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-15HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-14SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-12SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-06SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-22SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-21SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-13SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-12SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback