KS SB146 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amending statutes regulating late-term and partial birth abortion.
Title
Amending statutes regulating late-term and partial birth abortion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Committee | |
2011-02-25 | Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-24 | Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced |