KS SB143 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing certain individuals to be eligible for restricted driving privileges.
Title
Allowing certain individuals to be eligible for restricted driving privileges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, February 22, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb143/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb143_00_0000.pdf |