KS SB140 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax exemptions; Kansas dui impact center, inc.; active aging publishing inc.
Title
Sales tax exemptions; Kansas dui impact center, inc.; active aging publishing inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb140/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb140_00_0000.pdf |