KS SB14 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, January 25, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, January 25, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extending certain provisions of the governmental response to the COVID-19 pandemic in Kansas and providing certain relief related to health, welfare, property and economic security during this public health emergency.
Title
Extending certain provisions of the governmental response to the COVID-19 pandemic in Kansas and providing certain relief related to health, welfare, property and economic security during this public health emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 3 (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 34 Nay: 1 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Enacting clause be stricken - Yea: 5 Nay: 31 (Y: 5 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 34 Nay: 1 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Enacting clause be stricken - Yea: 5 Nay: 31 (Y: 5 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, January 25, 2021 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, January 25, 2021 |
2021-01-21 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 3 |
2021-01-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-01-20 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary and referred to Committee of the Whole |
2021-01-19 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 19, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-01-15 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-15 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 34 Nay: 1 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Enacting clause be stricken Yea: 5 Nay: 31 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Wednesday, January 13, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 12, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |