KS SB136 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating a bridge on United States highway 77 in Cowley county as the SGT Kevin A. Gilbertson memorial bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on United States highway 77 in Cowley county as the SGT Kevin A. Gilbertson memorial bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 21, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |