KS SB13 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, March 26, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, March 26, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing notice and public hearing requirements prior to approval by a governing body to exceed its revenue neutral rate for property tax purposes and discontinuing the city and county tax lid, prohibiting valuation increase of real property solely as the result of normal repair, replacement or maintenance of existing structure, establishing a payment plan for the payment of delinquent or nondelinquent property taxes and establishing the taxpayer notification costs fund.
Title
Establishing notice and public hearing requirements prior to approval by a governing body to exceed its revenue neutral rate for property tax purposes and discontinuing the city and county tax lid, prohibiting valuation increase of real property solely as the result of normal repair, replacement or maintenance of existing structure, establishing a payment plan for the payment of delinquent or nondelinquent property taxes and establishing the taxpayer notification costs fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 30 Nay: 5 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 3 (Y: 120 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 1 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Doll was rejected - Yea: 7 Nay: 27 (Y: 7 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 3 (Y: 120 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 1 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Doll was rejected - Yea: 7 Nay: 27 (Y: 7 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, March 26, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 30 Nay: 5 |
2021-03-04 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 3 |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-04 | House | House Representative Carpenter, B. raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Jennings |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Smith, A. was adopted |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Smith, A. |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2021-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 26, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-01-20 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 20, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2021-01-15 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2021-01-15 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 1 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Doll was rejected Yea: 7 Nay: 27 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Doll |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 12, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 8, 2021 |