KS SB121 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical care facilities, licensure and renewal of licenses.
Title
Medical care facilities, licensure and renewal of licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2013-03-26 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2013-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2013-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 14, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 118-N |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Introduced |