KS SB110 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Motion to move the bill above the line for consideration failed to reach a 2/3 majority. Motion rejected. Yea: 19 Nay: 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Motion to move the bill above the line for consideration failed to reach a 2/3 majority. Motion rejected. Yea: 19 Nay: 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting all social security benefits from Kansas income tax.
Title
Exempting all social security benefits from Kansas income tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Chase Blasi [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Motion to move the bill above the line for consideration failed to reach a 2/3 majority. Motion rejected. - Yea: 19 Nay: 16 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Motion to move the bill above the line for consideration failed to reach a 2/3 majority. Motion rejected. Yea: 19 Nay: 16 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate Introduced |