KS SB104 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - House Hearing: Wednesday, April 3, 2019, 3:00 PM Room 582-N
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the Kansas taxpayer protection act; requiring the signature and tax identification number of paid tax return preparers on income tax returns; authorizing actions to enjoin paid tax return preparers from engaging in certain conduct; establishing the golden years homestead property tax freeze act providing refund for certain increases in residential property taxes and allowing homestead property tax refund for renters; and expanding the expense deduction to all taxpayers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the Kansas taxpayer protection act; requiring the signature and tax identification number of paid tax return preparers on income tax returns; authorizing actions to enjoin paid tax return preparers from engaging in certain conduct; establishing the golden years homestead property tax freeze act providing refund for certain increases in residential property taxes and allowing homestead property tax refund for renters; and expanding the expense deduction to all taxpayers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, April 3, 2019, 3:00 PM Room 582-N
2019-04-01HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2019-04-01HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-02-12SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 12, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-02-06SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-02-05SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback