KS SB102 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring earlier notice of anticipated release from custody of a person who may be a sexually violent predator to the attorney general and a multidisciplinary team and specifying where such person will be detained during civil commitment proceedings.
Title
Requiring earlier notice of anticipated release from custody of a person who may be a sexually violent predator to the attorney general and a multidisciplinary team and specifying where such person will be detained during civil commitment proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-16 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 16, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 15, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELED |
2021-03-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Introduced |