KS SB100 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lobbyists; filings.
Title
Lobbyists; filings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2013-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 281-N |
2013-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2013-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics and Elections |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate Introduced |