KS SB10 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 27, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the right to earn a living act to minimize unnecessary occupational licensing and regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the right to earn a living act to minimize unnecessary occupational licensing and regulation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, January 27, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S
2021-01-12SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Commerce
2021-01-11SenateSenate Introduced
2021-01-11SenateSenate Prefiled for Introduction on Wednesday, January 6, 2021

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback