KS SB1 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - House Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - House Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the state fair board to use moneys in the state fair capital improvements fund for general operations for fiscal years 2021 and 2022.
Title
Authorizing the state fair board to use moneys in the state fair capital improvements fund for general operations for fiscal years 2021 and 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2021-02-05 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-05 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 37 Nay: 0 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 26, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, December 8, 2020 |