KS S1630 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-8)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-8)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Summary
Support of participation in Auger North cosmic ray observatory; formation of task force to lead collaboration with Colorado. Effective date: Upon Adoption.
Title
Support of participation in Auger North cosmic ray observatory; formation of task force to lead collaboration with Colorado. Effective date: Upon Adoption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in House committee | |
2010-05-05 | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism -HJ 1462 | |
2010-05-03 | Received and introduced -HJ 1411 | |
2010-04-30 | COW: CR be adptd; be adptd as am. -SJ 1390; EFA: Adptd as am.; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1391 | |
2010-04-28 | Referred to Commerce -SJ 1374; CR: Be adptd as am. by Commerce -SJ 1382 | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced -SJ 1299 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |