KS S1625 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Summary
Urging the federal government to act aggressively in addressing the threats of bioterrorism and to move quickly to advance the sale of Plum Island. Effective date: Upon Adoption.
Title
Urging the federal government to act aggressively in addressing the threats of bioterrorism and to move quickly to advance the sale of Plum Island. Effective date: Upon Adoption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died on General Orders in House | |
2010-03-29 | CR: Be adptd as am. by Transportation and Public Safety Budget -HJ 1309 | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing: Mon., 3/29/2010, 3:30 PM, Rm 142-S | |
2010-02-12 | Referred to Transportation and Public Safety Budget -HJ 917 | |
2010-02-11 | Received and introduced -HJ 910 | |
2010-02-10 | FA: Adptd; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1009 | |
2010-02-09 | COW: Be adptd -SJ 1002 | |
2010-02-02 | CR: Be adptd by Ways and Means -SJ 981 | |
2010-01-29 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 968 | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced -SJ 963 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |