KS S1614 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference committee
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference committee
Summary
Constitutional amendment; creating a budget stabilization fund and debt prepayment fund in the state treasury; annual transfers and withdrawals only under certain circumstances. Effective date: Upon Adoption.
Title
Constitutional amendment; creating a budget stabilization fund and debt prepayment fund in the state treasury; annual transfers and withdrawals only under certain circumstances. Effective date: Upon Adoption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in conference committee | |
2010-03-29 | Acceded; apptd Burgess, Landwehr, D.Gatewood -HJ 1307 | |
2010-03-24 | Nonconcurred; CC requested; apptd Vratil, D.Schmidt, Kelly -SJ 1263 | |
2010-03-24 | FA: Adptd as am.; Yeas 102 Nays 20 -HJ 1275 | |
2010-03-23 | COW: Be passed over and retain a place on calendar -HJ 1237; COW: CR be adptd; be further am.; be adptd as am. -HJ 1249 | |
2010-03-19 | COW: Be passed over and retain a place on calendar -HJ 1168 | |
2010-02-17 | CR: Be adptd as am. by Appropriations -HJ 959 | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing: Fri., 2/12/2010, 9:00 AM, Rm 346-S | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing: Tues., 2/9/2010, 9:00 AM, Rm 346-S | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Appropriations -HJ 415 | |
2009-03-24 | Received and introduced -HJ 401 | |
2009-03-23 | COW: Be adptd -SJ 414; EFA: Adptd; Yeas 32 Nays 8 -SJ 474 | |
2009-03-16 | CR: Be adptd by Ways and Means -SJ 334 | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 316 | |
2009-03-12 | Introduced -SJ 299 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |